AK SCR6 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/14 LEGIS RESOLVE 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/14 LEGIS RESOLVE 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 69, exempting certain firearms, firearm accessories, and ammunition in this state from federal regulation; declaring certain federal statutes, regulations, rules, and orders unconstitutional under the Constitution of the United States and unenforceable in this state; and providing criminal penalties for federal officials who enforce or attempt to enforce a federal statute, regulation, rule, or order regulating certain firearms and firearm accessories in this state.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 69
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate:
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate:
SCR 6 Final Passage(Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 6/14 LEGIS RESOLVE 11 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | 3:07 PM 5/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-11 | House | VERSION: SCR 6 |
2013-04-11 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-04-11 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2013-04-11 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2013-04-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2013-04-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 6 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-04-10 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2013-04-10 | Senate | TAKEN UP |
2013-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |