AK SCR5 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - 2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaiming March 2, 2019, as Alaska Reads Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Reads Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24Senate2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-22SenateLEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 21
2018-04-09HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON
2018-04-09HouseVERSION: SCR 5 AM
2018-04-09HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-09HousePASSED Y36 N1 E2 A1
2018-04-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2018
2018-04-06HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, GRENN
2018-03-21HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
2018-03-21HouseFN2: ZERO(LEG)
2018-03-21HouseDP: TALERICO, PARISH, ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ, KOPP, JOHNSTON, DRUMMOND
2018-03-21HouseEDC RPT 7DP
2018-03-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
2018-03-05HouseEDC
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-01SenateVERSION: SCR 5 AM
2018-03-01SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
2018-03-01SenatePASSED Y16 N1 E3
2018-03-01SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2018-03-01Senate...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-03-01SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2018-03-01SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-01SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2018
2018-02-16SenateFN2: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-16SenateAM: WILSON
2018-02-16SenateDP: MEYER, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN
2018-02-16SenateSTA RPT 4DP 1AM
2017-04-12SenateFN1: ZERO(S.EDC)
2017-04-12SenateDP: HUGHES, BEGICH, COGHILL
2017-04-12SenateEDC RPT 3DP
2017-02-24SenateEDC, STA
2017-02-24SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback