AK SCR28 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 385, relating to additional state contributions to the teachers' defined benefit retirement plan and the public employees' defined benefit retirement plan.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 385
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-20 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-23 | House | VERSION: SCR 28 |
2014-04-23 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-20 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2014-04-20 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2014-04-19 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 28 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-19 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-19 | Senate | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |