AK SCR23 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Joint Resolution No. 21, urging the federal government to respect the authority of the state to regulate marijuana use, production, and distribution and to honor previous federal guidance on marijuana policy; and urging the federal government to reconsider its listing of marijuana as a schedule I controlled substance.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hjr 21
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 37 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 2:46 PM 5/22/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-30 | House | VERSION: SCR 23 |
2018-04-30 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-30 | House | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 |
2018-04-30 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2018-04-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2018-04-18 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 23 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-18 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2018-04-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Business
Crimes
Drugs
Economic Development
Economy
Financial Institutions
Initiatives
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Public Land
Public Safety
Regulations
Uniform Rules
Crimes
Drugs
Economic Development
Economy
Financial Institutions
Initiatives
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Public Land
Public Safety
Regulations
Uniform Rules