AK SCR23 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 75, amending certain audit requirements for entities receiving contributions from permanent fund dividends; requiring the three main campuses of the University of Alaska to apply to be included on the contribution list for contributions from permanent fund dividends; and requiring the university to pay an application fee for each campus separately listed on the contribution list for contributions from permanent fund dividends.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 75
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - House - House:
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate:
SCR 23 Special Order of Business(Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate:
SCR 23 Final Passage(Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-23 | House | VERSION: SCR 23 |
2014-04-23 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-21 | House | PASSED Y38 N1 A1 |
2014-04-21 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2014-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 23 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-20 | Senate | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |