AK SCR22 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 275, extending the termination date of the Board of Massage Therapists; and relating to license renewal and criminal history record checks for massage therapists.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 275
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 29 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 2:46 PM 5/22/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-18 | House | VERSION: SCR 22 |
2018-04-18 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-18 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2018-04-18 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2018-04-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2018-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 22 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-17 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2018-04-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |