AK SCR22 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 137, raising certain fees related to sport fishing, hunting, and trapping; relating to the fish and game fund; providing for the repeal of the sport fishing surcharge and sport fishing facility revenue bonds; replacing the permanent sport fishing, hunting, or trapping identification card for certain residents with an identification card valid for three years; relating to hunting and fishing by proxy; relating to fish and game conservation decals; raising the age of eligibility for a sport fishing, hunting, or trapping license exemption for state residents; and raising the age at which a state resident is required to obtain a license for sport fishing, hunting, or trapping.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 137
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate:
2016-04-17 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
SCR 22 Final Passage(Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 6/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 35 |
2016-06-11 | Senate | 3:53 PM 6/8/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | House | VERSION: SCR 22 |
2016-04-17 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-04-17 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2016-04-17 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2016-04-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2016-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 22 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y19 A1 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2016-03-30 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |