AK SCR22 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Joint Resolution No. 25, urging the United States Congress to restore the presumption of a service connection for Agent Orange exposure to United States Veterans who served in the waters defined by and in the airspace over the combat zone in Vietnam.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hjr 25
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-17 | House | VERSION: SCR 22 |
2014-04-17 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2014-04-17 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2014-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 22 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-15 | Senate | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |