AK SCR201 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-24 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 44, relating to sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention efforts in public schools; and relating to dating violence and abuse awareness and prevention efforts in public schools.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 44
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate:
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate:
SCR 201 Final Passage(Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-24 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 29 |
2015-09-10 | Senate | 9:00 AM 6/25/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-11 | House | VERSION: SCR 201 |
2015-06-11 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2015-06-11 | House | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 |
2015-06-11 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2015-06-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2015-06-11 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 201 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | TAKEN UP |
2015-05-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |