AK SCR2 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mason's Manual of Legislative Procedure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Rules; Mason's Manual

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 13 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 13 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16SenatePERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S)
2021-05-26HouseRETURNED TO SENATE
2021-05-26HouseENGROSSED
2021-03-22HouseRECONSIDERATION FAILED Y20 N17 E2 A1
2021-03-22HouseRECON TAKEN UP - IN SECOND READING
2021-03-20HouseTUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2021-03-20HouseVERSION: SCR 2(FLD H)
2021-03-20HouseFAILED PASSAGE Y26 N6 E8
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 10 FAILED Y9 N23 E8
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 9 FAILED Y15 N17 E8
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 8 NOT OFFERED
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 7 FAILED Y11 N21 E8
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 6 FAILED Y14 N18 E8
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y13 N19 E8
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N17 E8
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2021-03-20HouseAM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
2021-03-20HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-03-19HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/19 - ON 3/20 CALENDAR
2021-03-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2021
2021-03-17HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME
2021-03-15SenateVERSION: SCR 2
2021-03-15SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-03-15SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-03-15SenatePASSED Y17 N- E1 A2
2021-03-15SenateBEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2021-03-15SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=SCR2
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SCR002A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/A/SCR002-H004.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SCR002B.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SCR2&Page=00457#0457
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SCR2&Page=00389#0389
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SCR2&Page=00399#0399
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SCR2&Page=00382#AM4
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SCR2&Page=00383#AM5
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SCR2&Page=00384#AM6
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SCR2&Page=00385#AM7
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SCR2&Page=00386#AM9
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SCR2&Page=00387#AM10

Bill Comments

feedback