AK SCR2 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - RETURNED TO RULES COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - RETURNED TO RULES COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming April 2017 as Sexual Assault Awareness Month.
Title
Sexual Assault Awareness Month:april 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | RETURNED TO RULES COMMITTEE |
2017-05-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-05-03 | House | NR: STUTES |
2017-05-03 | House | DNP: KITO, CLAMAN |
2017-05-03 | House | DP: EASTMAN, CHENAULT, REINBOLD, LEDOUX |
2017-05-03 | House | RLS RPT HCS(2D RLS) NT 4DP 2DNP 1NR |
2017-04-28 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR |
2017-04-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-04-27 | House | AM: EASTMAN, CHENAULT, REINBOLD |
2017-04-27 | House | DP: KITO, CLAMAN, STUTES, LEDOUX |
2017-04-27 | House | RLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 4DP 3AM |
2017-04-27 | House | RETURNED TO RULES COMMITTEE |
2017-04-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RULES REPORT |
2017-04-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-04-07 | House | NR: EASTMAN |
2017-04-07 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-04-07 | House | HSS RPT 5DP 1NR |
2017-03-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-03-24 | House | DP: JOHNSON, WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, BIRCH, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2017-03-24 | House | STA RPT 7DP |
2017-03-08 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2017-03-08 | House | STA, HSS |
2017-03-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-06 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 2 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-06 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | DP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE |
2017-03-03 | Senate | HSS RPT 5DP |
2017-02-24 | Senate | STA REFERRAL WAIVED UC |
2017-02-08 | Senate | STA, HSS |
2017-02-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |