AK SCR17 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaiming April 2018 as Sexual Assault Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

April 2018:sexual Assault Awareness Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 Table (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 Table (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 Table (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27SenateLEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 24
2018-06-27SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-06-27Senate2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, GARA, JOHNSTON, JOSEPHSON, DRUMMOND
2018-04-13HouseVERSION: SCR 17
2018-04-13HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-13HousePASSED Y36 N1 E1 A2
2018-04-13HouseAM NO 2 TABLED Y33 N5 E1 A1
2018-04-13HouseRESCIND ACTION TABLE AM 2 UC
2018-04-13HouseAM NO 2 TABLED Y35 N3 E1 A1
2018-04-13HouseAM NO 2 OFFERED
2018-04-13HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N35 E1 A1
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-12HouseNOT TAKEN UP 4/12 - ON 4/13 CALENDAR
2018-04-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): BIRCH, MILLETT, ZULKOSKY, CHENAULT
2018-04-11HouseHELD TO 4/12 CALENDAR
2018-04-11HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018
2018-04-06HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-06HouseDP: TUCK, BIRCH, KNOPP, LEDOUX, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-04-06HouseSTA RPT 6DP
2018-03-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, TUCK
2018-03-05HouseSTA
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-01SenateVERSION: SCR 17
2018-03-01SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-01SenatePASSED Y17 N- E3
2018-03-01SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2018-03-01SenateKELLY
2018-03-01SenateCOSTELLO, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, STEDMAN, MICCICHE, VON IMHOF, SHOWER, OLSON
2018-03-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, EGAN, WILSON, BISHOP
2018-03-01SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-01SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2018
2018-02-28SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-28SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN
2018-02-28SenateSTA RPT 5DP
2018-02-16SenateSTA
2018-02-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback