AK SCR15 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - 2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaiming April 16, 2019, as Alaska Education and Sharing Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

April 16, 2019:ak Education & Sharing Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SCR 15 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24Senate2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-22SenateLEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 20
2018-04-06SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
2018-04-06SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-04-04HouseVERSION: SCR 15 AM H
2018-04-04HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-04-04HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
2018-04-04HousePASSED Y40
2018-04-04HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2018-04-04House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-04-04HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y40
2018-04-04HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-02HouseNOT TAKEN UP 4/2 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR
2018-03-30HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/30 - ON 4/2 CALENDAR
2018-03-29HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR
2018-03-28HouseTECHNICAL SESSION 3/28 - ON 3/29 CALENDAR
2018-03-27HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/27 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR
2018-03-26HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/26 - ON 3/27 CALENDAR
2018-03-26HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2018
2018-03-22HouseRLS
2018-03-22HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-21SenateVERSION: SCR 15
2018-03-21SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-21SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-03-21SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2018-03-21SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-21SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2018
2018-03-14SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-03-14SenateNR: BEGICH
2018-03-14SenateDP: STEVENS, COGHILL, HUGHES
2018-03-14SenateEDC RPT 3DP 1NR
2018-02-02SenateEDC
2018-02-02SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback