AK SCR14 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - 3:04 PM 5/30/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to awarding the Alaska Decoration of Honor to certain members of the military.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Decoration Of Honor Award

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30Senate3:04 PM 5/30/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TILTON, TARR, ZULKOSKY, STUTES
2018-04-13HouseVERSION: SCR 14
2018-04-13HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-13HousePASSED Y39 E1
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-12HouseNOT TAKEN UP 4/12 - ON 4/13 CALENDAR
2018-04-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): BIRCH, CHENAULT
2018-04-11HouseHELD TO 4/12 CALENDAR
2018-04-11HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018
2018-03-15HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
2018-02-21HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2018-02-21HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-21HouseDP: RAUSCHER, REINBOLD, PARISH, TUCK
2018-02-21HouseMLV RPT 4DP
2018-02-02HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER, LEDOUX
2018-01-31HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, MILLETT, KAWASAKI, TUCK
2018-01-31HouseMLV
2018-01-31HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-29SenateVERSION: SCR 14
2018-01-29SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-01-29SenateHOFFMAN, GARDNER, EGAN, HUGHES, BEGICH, COGHILL, MEYER, WILSON, KELLY
2018-01-29SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MACKINNON, GIESSEL, BISHOP, STEDMAN, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
2018-01-29SenatePASSED Y18 N- A1 V1
2018-01-29SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2018-01-29SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-01-29SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 1/29/2018
2018-01-24SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-01-24SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL
2018-01-24SenateSTA RPT 5DP
2018-01-18SenateCOSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
2018-01-18SenateSTA
2018-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback