AK SCR14 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to awarding the Alaska Decoration of Honor to certain members of the military.
Title
Decoration Of Honor Award
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 23 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 3:04 PM 5/30/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TILTON, TARR, ZULKOSKY, STUTES |
2018-04-13 | House | VERSION: SCR 14 |
2018-04-13 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-13 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-12 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/12 - ON 4/13 CALENDAR |
2018-04-11 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BIRCH, CHENAULT |
2018-04-11 | House | HELD TO 4/12 CALENDAR |
2018-04-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2018-02-21 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2018-02-21 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-02-21 | House | DP: RAUSCHER, REINBOLD, PARISH, TUCK |
2018-02-21 | House | MLV RPT 4DP |
2018-02-02 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER, LEDOUX |
2018-01-31 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, MILLETT, KAWASAKI, TUCK |
2018-01-31 | House | MLV |
2018-01-31 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-01-29 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 14 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | HOFFMAN, GARDNER, EGAN, HUGHES, BEGICH, COGHILL, MEYER, WILSON, KELLY |
2018-01-29 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MACKINNON, GIESSEL, BISHOP, STEDMAN, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE |
2018-01-29 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- A1 V1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-01-29 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-01-29 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 1/29/2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | DP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL |
2018-01-24 | Senate | STA RPT 5DP |
2018-01-18 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI |
2018-01-18 | Senate | STA |
2018-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |