AK SCR14 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing October 2010 as Filipino American History Month.
Title
Filipino American History Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 40 | |
2010-07-09 | 11:40 AM 6/11/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-12 | STOLTZE, EDGMON | |
2010-04-12 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLMES, RAMRAS, KERTTULA, MILLETT, DAHLSTROM, TUCK, AUSTERMAN, | |
2010-04-12 | VERSION: SCR 14 | |
2010-04-12 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-12 | PASSED Y39 A1 | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, LYNN, JOHNSON, P.WILSON | |
2010-04-01 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2010-04-01 | DP: JOHNSON, GATTO, SEATON, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2010-04-01 | STA RPT 7DP | |
2010-03-30 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI | |
2010-03-19 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): PETERSEN, MUNOZ | |
2010-03-19 | STA | |
2010-03-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-18 | VERSION: SCR 14 | |
2010-03-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-18 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-03-18 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-03-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2010-03-16 | DP: MENARD, FRENCH, MEYER, PASKVAN | |
2010-03-16 | STA RPT 4DP | |
2010-02-24 | STA | |
2010-02-24 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |