AK SCR101 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 159, relating to the prescription of opioids; relating to voluntary nonopioid directives; relating to the controlled substance prescription database; relating to the practice of dentistry; relating to the practice of pharmacy; relating to the practice of medicine; relating to the practice of podiatry; relating to the practice of osteopathy; relating to the practice of nursing; relating to the practice of optometry; relating to the practice of veterinary medicine; relating to the duties of the Board of Pharmacy; and relating to pharmacists.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 159
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-18 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 12 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | 2:42 PM 6/28/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-22 | House | VERSION: SCR 101 |
2017-06-22 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2017-06-22 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2017-06-22 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2017-06-22 | House | WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 47 UC |
2017-06-22 | Senate | WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 47 UC |
2017-06-12 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2017-06-01 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 101 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2017-06-01 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2017-05-31 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Animals
Boards & Commissions
Corrections
Criminal Procedure
Dentists
Drugs
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians
Regulations
Uniform Rules
Boards & Commissions
Corrections
Criminal Procedure
Dentists
Drugs
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians
Regulations
Uniform Rules