AK SCR10 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaiming 2019 to be the Year of Innovation in Alaska.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Year Of Innovation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateLEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 34
2018-04-30SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-28HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI
2018-04-28HouseVERSION: CSSCR 10(STA)
2018-04-28HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-28HousePASSED Y35 N1 E4
2018-04-28HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-28HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2018
2018-04-23HouseL&C REFERRAL WAIVED
2018-03-09HouseFN2: ZERO(LEG)
2018-03-09HouseDP: LEDOUX, WOOL, JOHNSON, BIRCH, KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-03-09HouseSTA RPT 5DP
2018-02-12HouseSTA, L&C
2018-02-12HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-02-09SenateVERSION: CSSCR 10(STA)
2018-02-09SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-02-09SenatePASSED Y18 N- E1 V1
2018-02-09SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2018-02-09SenateSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2018-02-09SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-09SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/2018
2018-02-02SenateFN2: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-02SenateNR: WILSON, GIESSEL
2018-02-02SenateDP: MEYER, EGAN
2018-02-02SenateSTA RPT CS 2DP 2NR NEW TITLE
2017-04-12SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-04-12SenateAM: STEVENS
2017-04-12SenateDP: COSTELLO, HUGHES, MEYER, GARDNER
2017-04-12SenateL&C RPT CS 4DP 1AM NEW TITLE
2017-04-07SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, BEGICH
2017-04-07SenateL&C, STA
2017-04-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback