AK SCR1 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Suspend Uniform Rules 24a & 34c; Covid-19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspend Uniform Rules 24a & 34c; Covid-19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2021-03-03HouseCRA & STA REFERRALS REMOVED
2021-02-19HouseCRA, STA
2021-02-19HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-03SenateVERSION: SCR 1 AM
2021-02-03SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-02-03SenatePASSED Y19 N-
2021-02-03SenateAM NO 7 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2021-02-03SenateAM NO 6 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2021-02-03SenateAM NO 5 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2021-02-03SenateAM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
2021-02-03SenateAM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2021-02-03SenateAM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2021-02-03SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2021-02-03SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2021-02-03SenateTAKEN UP
2021-01-29SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback