AK SB98 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - FN3: (REV)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - FN3: (REV)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring the Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation to manage the power cost equalization endowment fund; requiring the Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation to publish certain reports relating to the power cost equalization endowment fund; relating to the Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation's management and investment of the power cost equalization endowment fund; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ak Perm Fund Corp. & Pce Endowment Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - House - PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y39 N1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - PASSED Y39 N1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - House - RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 FAILED Y1 N39 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - House - AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N38 E1 (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - House - AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N38 E1 (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - PASSED Y16 N3 E1 (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - PASSED Y39 N1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - House - RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 FAILED Y1 N39 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - House - AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N38 E1 (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - House - AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N38 E1 (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - PASSED Y16 N3 E1 (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | House | FN3: (REV) |
2023-10-16 | House | FN2: (REV) |
2023-10-16 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2023-10-16 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 39 |
2023-10-16 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/23 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/23 CHAPTER 12 SLA 23 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | 11:45 A.M. 6/15/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-16 | House | VERSION: CSSB 98(FIN) |
2023-05-16 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2023-05-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-16 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y39 N1 |
2023-05-16 | House | RECON SAME DAY UC - IN THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | House | SADDLER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2023-05-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-16 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2023-05-16 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 FAILED Y1 N39 |
2023-05-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 98(FIN) |
2023-05-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CALENDAR |
2023-05-15 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N38 E1 |
2023-05-15 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N38 E1 |
2023-05-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-15 | House | SESSION CANCELED 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR |
2023-05-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2023 |
2023-05-08 | House | FN3: (REV) |
2023-05-08 | House | FN2: (REV) |
2023-05-08 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2023-05-08 | House | AM: GALVIN |
2023-05-08 | House | FOSTER |
2023-05-08 | House | DP: TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, HANNAN, STAPP, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, EDGMON, D.JOHNSON, |
2023-05-08 | House | FIN RPT 9DP 1AM |
2023-04-26 | House | FIN |
2023-04-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-04-25 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 98(FIN) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-04-25 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N3 E1 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 98(FIN) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/25 CAL |
2023-04-24 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2023-04-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-04-24 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/23 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | FN3: (REV) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | FN2: (REV) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | FN1: (REV) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | NR: KIEHL, MERRICK |
2023-04-21 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, BISHOP |
2023-04-21 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 4DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | FIN |
2023-03-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Finance
Funds
Investments
Permanent Fund
Public Corporations
Public Finance
Revenue
Utilities
Finance
Funds
Investments
Permanent Fund
Public Corporations
Public Finance
Revenue
Utilities