AK SB98 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 5 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-05 - LEG FIN MESSAGE & FN7 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR 9/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 5 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-05 - LEG FIN MESSAGE & FN7 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR 9/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to adult adoption; relating to medical assistance for recipients of adult home care services; establishing an adult home care home license and procedures; providing for the transition of individuals from foster care to adult home care settings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Adult Home Care; Adult Adoption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | LEG FIN MESSAGE & FN7 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR 9/1/22 |
2022-10-05 | House | FN7: (CC:HB281/DHS/DOH) |
2022-10-05 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281 |
2022-10-05 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22 |
2022-04-29 | House | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES |
2022-04-29 | House | HSS, FIN |
2022-04-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-27 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 98(FIN) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 98(FIN) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-04-27 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-27 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-26 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | FN6: (DHS/DOH) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | FN5: (DHS/DOH) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DHS/DOH) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI |
2022-04-15 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2021-03-31 | Senate | FN3: (DHS) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | NR: REINBOLD |
2021-03-31 | Senate | DP: WILSON, BEGICH, COSTELLO, HUGHES |
2021-03-31 | Senate | HSS RPT 4DP 1NR |
2021-03-03 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-03-03 | Senate | FN3: (DHS) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2021-03-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Adoption
Child Custody
Disabilities
Families
Federal Aid
Foster Care
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Nursing Homes
Child Custody
Disabilities
Families
Federal Aid
Foster Care
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Nursing Homes