AK SB95 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/8/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/8/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the right of first refusal of a volunteer search and rescue group with respect to obsolete or surplus state property.
Title
Search And Rescue Surplus State Property
Sponsors
Sen. David Wilson [R] | Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] | Sen. Lyman Hoffman [D] | Rep. DeLena Johnson [R] |
Rep. Neal Foster [D] | Rep. Cathy Tilton [R] | Rep. Kevin McCabe [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 95(STA) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/8/22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/10 CHAPTER 60 SLA 22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | 9:45 A.M. 8/4/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-17 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N- E1 A2 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2022-05-17 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 95(STA) |
2022-05-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-16 | House | ENGROSSED |
2022-05-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TILTON, MCCABE |
2022-05-16 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2022-05-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 95(STA) |
2022-05-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-16 | House | STA HCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022 |
2022-05-09 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2022-05-09 | House | NR: EASTMAN |
2022-05-09 | House | DP: TARR, VANCE, STORY, CLAMAN |
2022-05-09 | House | STA RPT HCS(STA) 4DP 1NR |
2022-03-18 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2021-05-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-05-13 | House | AM: HANNAN |
2021-05-13 | House | NR: MCCARTY, PRAX |
2021-05-13 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, MCCABE, PATKOTAK, SCHRAGE |
2021-05-13 | House | CRA RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM |
2021-05-06 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2021-05-04 | House | CRA, STA |
2021-05-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-03 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 95(STA) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 95(STA) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-03 | Senate | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-03 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-03 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2021-04-28 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(STA) 7DP |
2021-04-07 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN |
2021-04-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | DP: KAWASAKI, COSTELLO, HOLLAND |
2021-03-31 | Senate | NR: SHOWER, REINBOLD |
2021-04-03 | Senate | STA CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE |
2021-03-31 | Senate | STA RPT CS (FORTHCOMING) 3DP 2NR |
2021-03-03 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2021-03-03 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2021-03-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |