AK SB9 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to alcoholic beverages; relating to the regulation of manufacturers, wholesalers, and retailers of alcoholic beverages; relating to licenses, endorsements, and permits involving alcoholic beverages; relating to common carrier approval to transport or deliver alcoholic beverages; relating to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board; relating to offenses involving alcoholic beverages; amending Rule 17(h), Alaska Rules of Minor Offense Procedure; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control; Alcohol Reg
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment(s) to CSSB 9(FIN) Court Rule(s) Effective Date(s) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 3 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rule(s) Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Withdraw Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 3 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rule(s) Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Withdraw Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-06-17 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 8 SLA 22 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | 9:30 A.M. 6/15/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-13 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N1 A2 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2022-05-15 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 9(FIN) AM H |
2022-05-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2022-05-15 | House | COURT RULE(S) ADOPTED Y36 A4 |
2022-05-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y35 A5 |
2022-05-15 | House | PASSED Y35 N2 A3 |
2022-05-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 9(FIN) AM |
2022-05-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-15 | House | AM NO 6 ADOPTED Y20 N17 A3 |
2022-05-15 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y15 N22 A3 |
2022-05-15 | House | AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED |
2022-05-15 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N32 A3 |
2022-05-15 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y3 N34 A3 |
2022-05-15 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2022-05-15 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N30 E3 A4 |
2022-05-15 | House | FIN HCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-14 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | SESSION CANCELED 5/13 - ON 5/14 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2022 |
2022-05-02 | House | FN10: ZERO(DHS) |
2022-05-02 | House | FN9: ZERO(CED) |
2022-05-02 | House | FN8: (CED) |
2022-05-02 | House | FN7: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2022-05-02 | House | FN6: (AJS) |
2022-05-02 | House | NR: LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, WOOL |
2022-05-02 | House | DP: JOSEPHSON, MERRICK |
2022-05-02 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 2DP 4NR |
2022-02-22 | House | FN10: ZERO(DHS) |
2022-02-22 | House | FN9: ZERO(CED) |
2022-02-22 | House | FN8: (CED) |
2022-02-22 | House | FN7: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2022-02-22 | House | FN6: (AJS) |
2022-02-22 | House | DP: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, NELSON, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2022-02-22 | House | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 7DP |
2022-02-09 | House | L&C, FIN |
2022-02-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-02-08 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 9(FIN) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-02-08 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-02-08 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2022-02-08 | Senate | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AM NO 1 Y10 N8 E2 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2022-02-08 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM NO 1 UC |
2022-02-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(FIN) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/8 CALENDAR |
2022-02-04 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-02-04 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-02-04 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/4/2022 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | FN10: ZERO(DHS) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | FN9: ZERO(CED) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | FN8: (CED) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | FN7: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | FN6: (AJS) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | AM: WILSON, OLSON |
2022-02-04 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN |
2022-02-04 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI |
2022-02-04 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 2DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | FN1: (AJS) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | AM: KIEHL |
2021-04-14 | Senate | NR: SHOWER, HUGHES |
2021-04-14 | Senate | DP: REINBOLD, MYERS |
2021-04-14 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 2DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | FN1: (AJS) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | NR: STEVENS |
2021-03-15 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, REVAK |
2021-03-15 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR |
2021-01-22 | Senate | L&C, JUD, FIN |
2021-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-01-22 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Age Of Persons
Alcohol
Assessments
Auctions
Boards & Commissions
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Fees
Health & Social Services
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licensing
Minors
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Permits
Public Accommodations
Public Records
Public Safety
Safety
Sales
Tourism
Trade Practices
Unorganized Borough
Alcohol
Assessments
Auctions
Boards & Commissions
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Fees
Health & Social Services
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licensing
Minors
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Permits
Public Accommodations
Public Records
Public Safety
Safety
Sales
Tourism
Trade Practices
Unorganized Borough