AK SB9 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/29/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to military facility zones; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Facility Zones

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/29/17
2017-05-03SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 4/28 CHAPTER 4 SLA 17
2017-04-27Senate5:00 PM 4/26/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-04-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, GRENN, JOSEPHSON
2017-04-12HouseVERSION: CSSB 9(FIN)
2017-04-12HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2017-04-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-12HousePASSED Y40
2017-04-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(FIN)
2017-04-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2017
2017-03-29HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER
2017-03-16HouseFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-03-16HouseDP: WESTLAKE, TALERICO, FANSLER, PARISH
2017-03-16HouseCRA RPT 4DP
2017-03-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2017-03-06HouseCRA
2017-03-06HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-01SenateVERSION: CSSB 9(FIN)
2017-03-01SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-03-01SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-03-01SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-03-01SenateHUGHES, KELLY
2017-03-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, MICCICHE,
2017-03-01SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(FIN)
2017-03-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-01SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-01SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-01SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2017
2017-02-15SenateFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-02-15SenateDP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
2017-02-15SenateNR: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, DUNLEAVY, OLSON
2017-02-15SenateFIN RPT CS 3DP 4NR NEW TITLE
2017-02-03SenateFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-02-03SenateDP: BISHOP, GARDNER, MACKINNON
2017-02-03SenateCRA RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE
2017-01-18SenateCRA, FIN
2017-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback