AK SB89 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/23/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/23/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to house rules for assisted living homes.
Title
Assisted Living Homes: House Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-30 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/23/21 |
2021-08-30 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/25 CHAPTER 27 SLA 21 |
2021-08-19 | Senate | 10:50 A.M. 8/19/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2021-05-19 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 89(HSS) |
2021-05-19 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED Y30 N10 |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 89(HSS) |
2021-05-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-19 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y16 N24 |
2021-05-19 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y16 N24 |
2021-05-19 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N31 |
2021-05-19 | House | HSS HCS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1 |
2021-05-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-05-14 | House | NR: FIELDS, PRAX |
2021-05-14 | House | DNP: KURKA |
2021-05-14 | House | DP: SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER |
2021-05-14 | House | HSS RPT HCS(HSS) 4DP 1DNP 2NR |
2021-04-28 | House | HSS |
2021-04-28 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-26 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 89(FIN) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 89(FIN) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-04-26 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-04-26 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-26 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2021-04-14 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, VON IMHOF |
2021-04-14 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2021-03-31 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | NR: REINBOLD |
2021-03-31 | Senate | DP: WILSON, BEGICH, COSTELLO, HUGHES |
2021-03-31 | Senate | HSS RPT 4DP 1NR |
2021-02-22 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-02-22 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2021-02-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |