AK SB89 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/25/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/25/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Legislative Ethics Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Legislature: Ethics, Conflicts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Adopt the Free Conference Committee Report Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Recede (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 89(JUD) Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Adopt the Free Conference Committee Report Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Recede (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 89(JUD) Effective Date (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/25/19 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 5/24 CH 5 SLA 19 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | 5:55 P.M. 5/1/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-04-24 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-04-24 | House | FCC RPT ADPTD Y33 N7 FCCS SB 89 |
2019-04-24 | House | FCC REPORT: FCCS SB 89 RECEIVED 4/22/19 3:03 P.M. |
2019-04-24 | House | FCC REPORT READ AND TAKEN UP |
2019-04-22 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-04-22 | Senate | FCC RPT ADPTD Y16 N3 A1 FCCS SB 89 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | UNIFORM RULE 42 (B) WAIVED UC |
2019-04-22 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | FCC REPORT: FCCS SB 89 RECEIVED 4/22/19 3:01 PM |
2019-04-22 | House | CLAMAN (CHAIR), TUCK, PRUITT |
2019-04-22 | House | FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2019-04-22 | House | FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2019-04-22 | House | WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 42(A) Y38 N1 E1 |
2019-04-22 | House | FAILED RECEDE (H) AM N39 E1 |
2019-04-22 | House | RECEDE MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC |
2019-04-22 | House | RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2019-04-17 | Senate | COGHILL (CHAIR), STEVENS, BEGICH |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2019-04-17 | Senate | UNIFORM RULE 42 (A) WAIVED UC |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y- N20 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2019-04-12 | Senate | HELD TO SECRETARY'S DESK UC |
2019-04-12 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/12 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CONCUR VOTE HELD TO 4/12/19 UC |
2019-04-10 | Senate | RESCIND ACTION ON CONCURRENCE UC |
2019-04-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N3 E1 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2019-04-08 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 89(JUD) |
2019-04-08 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2019-04-08 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-04-08 | House | PASSED Y33 N4 E3 |
2019-04-08 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 89(JUD) |
2019-04-08 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-04-08 | 500 | |
2019-04-08 | House | JUD HCS ADOPTED UC |
2019-04-08 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-08 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2019-04-08 | House | AM: WOOL |
2019-04-08 | House | DNP: EASTMAN |
2019-04-08 | House | DP: STUTES, KOPP, CLAMAN |
2019-04-08 | House | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 3DP 1DNP 1AM |
2019-03-29 | House | JUD |
2019-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-03-27 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 89(JUD) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-03-27 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N4 E1 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 89(JUD) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-03-27 | 647 | |
2019-03-27 | 646 | |
2019-03-27 | 639 | |
2019-03-27 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-03-27 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-03-27 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | AM: KIEHL |
2019-03-22 | Senate | NR: REINBOLD, MICCICHE, SHOWER |
2019-03-22 | Senate | DP: HUGHES |
2019-03-22 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 1DP 3NR 1AM SAME TITLE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | JUD |
2019-03-13 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |