AK SB88 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2-2)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - SIGNED INTO LAW 8/10 CHAPTER 22 SLA 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing a land exchange with the federal government in which certain Alaska mental health trust land is exchanged for certain national forest land and relating to the costs of the exchange; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ak Mental Health Trust Land Exchange

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-06SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 8/10 CHAPTER 22 SLA 17
2017-10-06SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2017-10-06Senate2:50 PM 7/31/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-05-10HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SADDLER
2017-05-10HouseVERSION: CSSB 88(RES)
2017-05-10HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2017-05-10HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-05-10HousePASSED Y38 N1 E1
2017-05-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 88(RES)
2017-05-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-05-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2017
2017-04-26HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-04-19HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GRENN, THOMPSON, KAWASAKI, PRUITT
2017-04-19HouseFN1: ZERO(DNR)
2017-04-19HouseNR: GUTTENBERG, GARA
2017-04-19HouseDP: TILTON, GRENN, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, PRUITT, WILSON, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-19HouseFIN RPT 8DP 2NR
2017-04-14HouseFIN
2017-04-14HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-13SenateVERSION: CSSB 88(RES)
2017-04-13SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-04-13SenateCOSPONSOR(S): STEVENS, COSTELLO, BISHOP, HUGHES, EGAN, MEYER, KELLY
2017-04-13SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-13SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-04-13SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 88(RES)
2017-04-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-13SenateRES CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-13SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-13SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2017
2017-04-12SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
2017-04-12SenateFN1: ZERO(DNR)
2017-04-12SenateNR: OLSON
2017-04-12SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
2017-04-12SenateFIN RPT CS(RES) 5DP 1NR
2017-04-11SenateCOSPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, GIESSEL
2017-04-06SenateFN1: ZERO(DNR)
2017-04-06SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER
2017-04-06SenateDP: GIESSEL, HUGHES, COGHILL, STEDMAN
2017-04-06SenateRES RPT CS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2017-03-10SenateRES, FIN
2017-03-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback