AK SB86 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the sale or other disposal, leasing, or encumbrance of Alaska Railroad Corporation land; relating to the financing and bonding authority of the Alaska Railroad Corporation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Railroad Corp: Land;bonds,finance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseREFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2018-04-11HouseL&C, FIN
2018-04-11HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-09SenateVERSION: CSSB 86(FIN) AM
2018-04-09SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-04-09SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
2018-04-09SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-09SenatePASSED Y17 N3
2018-04-09SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-04-09SenateAM NO 3 ADOPTED UC
2018-04-09SenateAM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
2018-04-09SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2018-04-09SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2018-04-09SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 86(FIN)
2018-04-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR
2018-04-06SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-06SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-06SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2018
2018-03-29SenateCOSPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, BISHOP, COSTELLO
2018-03-28SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2018-03-28SenateNR: OLSON
2018-03-28SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-03-28SenateFIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2018-02-14SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2018-02-14SenateAM: WIELECHOWSKI
2018-02-14SenateNR: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN
2018-02-14SenateDP: GIESSEL, COGHILL, MEYER
2018-02-14SenateRES RPT CS 3DP 3NR 1AM SAME TITLE
2018-02-09SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEVENS
2017-03-10SenateRES, FIN
2017-03-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback