AK SB80 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to telecommunications services for certain disabled subscribers; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: Disabled Subscribers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 80(L&C) Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
2018-05-12SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-05-11HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 80(L&C)
2018-05-11HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-05-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2018-05-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11HousePASSED Y38 N1 A1
2018-05-11HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 80(L&C)
2018-05-10HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, TUCK, TARR
2018-05-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
2018-05-10HouseL&C HCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2018
2018-04-20HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER
2018-04-18HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2018-04-04HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2018-03-19HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
2018-03-15HouseFN2: ZERO(CED)
2018-03-15HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KNOPP, BIRCH, WOOL, KITO
2018-03-15HouseL&C RPT HCS(L&C) 5DP
2017-04-19HouseL&C
2017-04-19HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-17SenateVERSION: CSSB 80(L&C)
2017-04-17SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-04-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-17SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2017-04-17SenateCOSPONSOR(S): STEVENS, MICCICHE, BISHOP
2017-04-17SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 80(L&C)
2017-04-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-17SenateL&C CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-17SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2017
2017-04-16SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-04-16SenateDP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
2017-04-16SenateNR: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, HUGHES, OLSON
2017-04-16SenateFIN RPT CS(L&C) 3DP 4NR
2017-04-14SenateFIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2017-04-07SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-04-07SenateNR: HUGHES
2017-04-07SenateDP: COSTELLO, STEVENS
2017-04-07SenateL&C RPT CS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2017-03-08SenateL&C, FIN
2017-03-08SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback