AK SB80 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the practice of telemedicine; relating to licenses for out-of-state physicians or podiatrists to practice telemedicine in this state under certain circumstances; and relating to insurance coverage for telemedicine.
Title
Out-of-state Phys. License; Telemedicine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-03-19 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | NR: HOFFMAN |
2014-03-19 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, OLSON |
2014-03-19 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2014-02-21 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN |
2014-02-21 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE |
2014-02-21 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2013-04-03 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS |
2013-03-15 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2013-03-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Business
Data Processing
Fees
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Internet
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Physicians
Science & Technology
Business
Data Processing
Fees
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Internet
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Physicians
Science & Technology