AK SB79 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-15 - COSPONSOR(S): MEYER, MENARD, KOOKESH
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-15 - COSPONSOR(S): MEYER, MENARD, KOOKESH
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act waiving payment of premiums for major medical insurance under the defined benefit retirement plan for public employees for disabled peace officers who have at least 20 years of credited service as peace officers.
Title
Med Benefits Of Disabled Peace Officers
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Egan [D] | Sen. Johnny Ellis [D] | Sen. Albert Kookesh [D] | Sen. Lesil McGuire [R] |
Sen. Linda Menard [R] | Sen. Kevin Meyer [R] | Sen. Joe Paskvan [D] | Sen. Joe Thomas [D] |
Sen. William Wielechowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | COSPONSOR(S): MEYER, MENARD, KOOKESH | |
2010-02-10 | COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2010-02-05 | COSPONSOR(S): EGAN | |
2010-01-22 | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS | |
2009-03-05 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-03-05 | FN1: (ADM) | |
2009-03-05 | DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, DAVIS | |
2009-03-05 | L&C RPT CS(STA) 3DP | |
2009-02-20 | FN1: (ADM) | |
2009-02-20 | DP: MENARD, FRENCH, MEYER, PASKVAN, KOOKESH | |
2009-02-20 | STA RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE | |
2009-02-04 | COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN | |
2009-01-26 | STA, L&C, FIN | |
2009-01-26 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |