AK SB78 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - FN7: (H.FIN/REV)(CORRECTED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act creating the education endowment fund and the dividend raffle fund; authorizing donations from the permanent fund dividend for educational purposes and to enter the permanent fund dividend raffle; relating to transfers from the dividend raffle fund and the education endowment fund; relating to the duties of the Department of Revenue; relating to the definition of 'gambling'; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Perm Fund Dividend Contributions/raffle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseFN7: (H.FIN/REV)(CORRECTED)
2018-04-17HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON
2018-04-17HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2018-04-17HouseFN9: (REV)
2018-04-17HouseFN8: (H.FIN/REV)
2018-04-17HouseFN7: (H.FIN/REV)
2018-04-17HouseFN6: INDETERMINATE(H.FIN/EED)
2018-04-17HouseFN5: ZERO(LAW)
2018-04-17HouseNR: GARA, ORTIZ, TILTON
2018-04-17HouseDNP: KAWASAKI, PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, GRENN
2018-04-17HouseDP: WILSON, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-17HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 4DNP 3NR
2017-04-15HouseFIN
2017-04-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-14SenateVERSION: CSSB 78(FIN)
2017-04-14SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-04-14SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-14SenatePASSED Y19 N1
2017-04-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 78(FIN)
2017-04-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-14SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-14SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2017
2017-04-14SenateFN4: (S.FIN/REV)
2017-04-14SenateFN3: (REV)
2017-04-14SenateFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2017-04-14SenateAM: VON IMHOF
2017-04-14SenateNR: OLSON
2017-04-14SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, HUGHES, MICCICHE
2017-04-14SenateFIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR 1AM
2017-03-31SenateFN3: (REV)
2017-03-31SenateFN2: (REV)
2017-03-31SenateFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2017-03-31SenateNR: BEGICH, GIESSEL, COGHILL
2017-03-31SenateDP: HUGHES
2017-03-31SenateEDC RPT CS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
2017-03-06SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MEYER, DUNLEAVY, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, HUGHES, MICCICHE
2017-03-06SenateEDC, FIN
2017-03-06SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback