AK SB76 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/14/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to vehicles abandoned on private property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned Vehicles; Private Property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-19SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/14/21
2021-08-19SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 8/16 CHAPTER 25 SLA 21
2021-08-16Senate3:00 P.M. 8/13/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2021-05-19HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY, JOHNSON, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, VANCE
2021-05-19HouseVERSION: SB 76
2021-05-19HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2021-05-19HousePASSED Y38 A2
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 76
2021-05-19HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-19HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N33 A2
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021
2021-05-19HouseLIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
2021-05-19HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2021-05-19HouseDP: DRUMMOND, CRONK, MCCABE, MCKAY, SPOHNHOLZ, HANNAN, HOPKINS
2021-05-19HouseTRA RPT 7DP
2021-05-10HouseTRA
2021-05-10HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-07SenateVERSION: SB 76
2021-05-07SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-05-07SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2021-05-07SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 76
2021-05-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-07SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-07SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2021
2021-05-03SenateFN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2021-05-03SenateDP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
2021-05-03SenateL&C RPT 4DP
2021-04-23SenateFN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2021-04-23SenateDP: SHOWER, HOLLAND, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO
2021-04-23SenateSTA RPT 4DP
2021-02-10SenateSTA, L&C
2021-02-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback