AK SB76 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN3: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to alcoholic beverages; relating to the regulation of manufacturers, wholesalers, retailers, and common carriers of alcoholic beverages; relating to licenses, endorsements, and permits involving alcoholic beverages; relating to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board; relating to offenses involving alcoholic beverages; amending Rule 17(h), Alaska Rules of Minor Offense Procedure; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverage Control; Alcohol Reg

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rule Effective Dates (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseFN3: (CED)
2018-06-27HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-27HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-06-27SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-05-07HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-05-07HouseFN4: INDETERMINATE(REV)
2018-05-07HouseFN3: (CED)
2018-05-07HouseFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-05-07HouseAM: STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KNOPP
2018-05-07HouseDP: BIRCH, KITO
2018-05-07HouseL&C RPT HCS(L&C) 2DP 4AM
2018-05-01HouseL&C, FIN
2018-05-01HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-30SenateVERSION: CSSSSB 76(FIN)
2018-04-30SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-04-30SenateCOSPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, KELLY
2018-04-30SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-30SenateCOURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-30SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-30SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSSSB 76(FIN)
2018-04-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-30SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-30SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-30SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018
2018-04-30SenateFN3: (CED)
2018-04-30SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-30SenateDP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-04-30SenateNR: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, OLSON
2018-04-30SenateFIN RPT CS 4DP 3NR NEW TITLE
2018-04-14SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2018-04-14SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-14SenateFN1: (CED)
2018-04-14SenateAM: COSTELLO, SHOWER
2018-04-14SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI
2018-04-14SenateDP: COGHILL
2018-04-14SenateJUD RPT CS 1DP 1NR 2AM NEW TITLE
2018-04-06SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-06SenateFN1: (CED)
2018-04-06SenateAM: GARDNER
2018-04-06SenateDP: MICCICHE, MEYER
2018-04-06SenateNR: COSTELLO
2018-04-06SenateL&C RPT CS 2DP 1NR 1AM SAME TITLE
2017-05-11SenateL&C, JUD
2017-05-11SenateSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
2017-03-03SenateL&C, JUD
2017-03-03SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback