AK SB75 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commercial Vehicle Licensing Req's

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Vehicle Licensing Req's

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2019-05-15SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2019-05-15HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JACKSON, TARR, TUCK
2019-05-15HouseVERSION: SB 75
2019-05-15HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-15HousePASSED Y36 E2 A2
2019-05-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 75
2019-05-15HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-15HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-15HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2019
2019-05-10HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2019-05-10HouseDP: STORY, TALERICO, DRUMMOND, RASMUSSEN, WOOL
2019-05-10HouseTRA RPT 5DP
2019-05-01HouseTRA
2019-05-01HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-29SenateVERSION: SB 75
2019-04-29SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-04-29SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, STEDMAN, KAWASAKI, GIESSEL
2019-04-29SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2019-04-29SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 75
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-04-29SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-29SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2019
2019-04-26SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, MICCICHE, HUGHES
2019-04-26SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2019-04-26SenateNR: REINBOLD
2019-04-26SenateDP: COGHILL, MICCICHE
2019-04-26SenateSTA RPT 2DP 1NR
2019-03-29SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2019-03-29SenateNR: WILSON
2019-03-29SenateDP: HUGHES, SHOWER, KIEHL
2019-03-29SenateTRA RPT 3DP 1NR
2019-03-06SenateTRA, STA
2019-03-06SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback