AK SB74 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Internet For Schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet For Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-05-10HouseFIN
2019-05-10HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-05-09SenateVERSION: CSSB 74(FIN)
2019-05-09SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-05-09SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-09SenatePASSED Y19 N1
2019-05-09SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 74(FIN)
2019-05-09SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-09SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2019-05-09SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-09SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2019
2019-05-06SenateFN2: EED
2019-05-06SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON
2019-05-06SenateDP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, BISHOP
2019-05-06SenateFIN RPT CS 4DP 2NR NEW TITLE
2019-04-03SenateBEGICH, SHOWER
2019-04-03SenateCOSPONSOR(S): STEVENS, GRAY-JACKSON, HUGHES, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, COSTELLO
2019-04-01SenateFN1: EED
2019-04-01SenateDP: STEVENS, COSTELLO, BIRCH, HUGHES
2019-04-01SenateEDC RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
2019-03-06SenateEDC, FIN
2019-03-06SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback