AK SB72 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to civics education, civics assessments, and secondary school graduation requirements; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sec. School Civics Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-16HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
2022-04-29HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2022-04-29HouseFN3: (EED)
2022-04-29HouseNR: HOPKINS, PRAX, GILLHAM, CRONK
2022-04-29HouseDP: STORY, DRUMMOND
2022-04-29HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 14
2022-04-29HouseEDC RPT HCS(EDC) NEW TITLE 2DP 4NR
2022-03-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2022-02-17HouseEDC, FIN
2022-02-17HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-02-16SenateVERSION: CSSB 72(FIN)
2022-02-16SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2022-02-16SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, BISHOP, SHOWER
2022-02-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2022-02-16SenatePASSED Y19 N1
2022-02-16SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 72(FIN)
2022-02-15SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MYERS, REVAK, STEDMAN, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO, VON IMHOF
2022-02-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/16 CALENDAR
2022-02-15SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2022-02-15SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-02-14SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/15/2022
2022-02-09SenateFN2: (EED)
2022-02-09SenateNR: OLSON
2022-02-09SenateDP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI
2022-02-09SenateFIN RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2021-04-21SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER CRA
2021-04-21SenateFN1: (EED)
2021-04-21SenateNR: MYERS, WILSON
2021-04-21SenateDP: HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON
2021-04-21SenateCRA RPT CS 2DP 2NR NEW TITLE
2021-03-24SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, MICCICHE
2021-03-24SenateFN1: (EED)
2021-03-24SenateDP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BEGICH
2021-03-24SenateEDC RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
2021-02-05SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BEGICH
2021-02-05SenateEDC, CRA
2021-02-05SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback