AK SB72 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to use of child safety seats and seat belts.
Title
Child Safety Seats & Seat Belts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/09 | |
2009-08-05 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 34 SLA 09 | |
2009-08-05 | 10:35 AM 6/11/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-04-19 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- A1 VACANT 1 | |
2009-04-19 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2009-04-19 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 72(FIN) AM H | |
2009-04-19 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2009-04-19 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLMES | |
2009-04-19 | PASSED Y33 N5 A2 | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 72(FIN) AM H | |
2009-04-19 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-19 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-19 | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-19 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2009 | |
2009-04-18 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2009-04-18 | NR: KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, HAWKER, STOLTZE | |
2009-04-18 | DP: GARA, CRAWFORD, AUSTERMAN, JOULE | |
2009-04-18 | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 4NR | |
2009-04-13 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2009-04-13 | AM: JOHNSON, P.WILSON, GATTO | |
2009-04-13 | NR: GRUENBERG | |
2009-04-13 | DP: SEATON, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2009-04-13 | STA RPT HCS(STA) 3DP 1NR 3AM | |
2009-03-23 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG | |
2009-03-23 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2009-03-23 | NR: JOHANSEN, MUNOZ | |
2009-03-23 | DP: DOOGAN, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON | |
2009-03-23 | TRA RPT HCS(TRA) 3DP 2NR | |
2009-02-27 | TRA, STA, FIN | |
2009-02-27 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-02-25 | VERSION: CSSB 72(STA) | |
2009-02-25 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-02-25 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2009-02-25 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 72(STA) | |
2009-02-25 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-02-25 | STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-02-25 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-02-25 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2009 | |
2009-02-20 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2009-02-20 | DP: MENARD, FRENCH, MEYER, PASKVAN, KOOKESH | |
2009-02-20 | STA RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE | |
2009-02-11 | COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN | |
2009-02-11 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2009-02-11 | DP: KOOKESH, MENARD, DAVIS, MEYER, PASKVAN | |
2009-02-11 | TRA RPT 5DP | |
2009-01-21 | TRA, STA | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |