AK SB70 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to opioid overdose drugs; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid Overdose Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/21
2021-08-16SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 14 SLA 21
2021-06-28Senate9:08 A.M. 6/28/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2021-04-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, RAUSCHER
2021-04-12HouseVERSION: CSSB 70(HSS)
2021-04-12HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2021-04-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-04-12HousePASSED Y39 E1
2021-04-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 70(HSS)
2021-04-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-04-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-04-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2021
2021-03-31HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2021-03-31HouseDP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, PRAX, KURKA, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER
2021-03-31HouseHSS RPT 7DP
2021-03-01HouseHSS
2021-03-01HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-24SenateVERSION: CSSB 70(HSS)
2021-02-24SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-02-24SenateSTEDMAN, MICCICHE
2021-02-24SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, KIEHL, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, VON IMHOF, STEVENS,
2021-02-24SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-02-24SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2021-02-24SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 70(HSS)
2021-02-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-02-24SenateHSS CS ADOPTED UC
2021-02-24SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-02-24SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2021
2021-02-19SenateFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2021-02-19SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, HUGHES
2021-02-19SenateHSS RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE
2021-02-05SenateHSS
2021-02-05SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback