AK SB7 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/26/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/26/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring the Department of Public Safety to publish certain policies and procedures on the department's Internet website.
Title
State Trooper Policies: Public Access
Sponsors
Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] | Sen. Tom Begich [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Rep. Adam Wool [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/26/22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/28 CHAPTER 45 SLA 22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-10-05 | Senate | 4:00 P.M. 7/22/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL |
2022-05-16 | House | VERSION: CSSB 7(JUD) |
2022-05-16 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-16 | House | PASSED Y29 N9 E2 |
2022-05-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 7(JUD) |
2022-05-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CALENDAR |
2022-05-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-14 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | SESSION CANCELED 5/13 - ON 5/14 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | SESSION CANCELED 5/12 - ON 5/13 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2022-04-26 | House | NR: KREISS-TOMKINS, KURKA, VANCE |
2022-04-26 | House | DNP: EASTMAN |
2022-04-26 | House | DP: SNYDER, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN |
2022-04-26 | House | JUD RPT 3DP 1DNP 3NR |
2022-04-04 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR |
2022-04-04 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2022-04-04 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2022-04-04 | House | NR: KAUFMAN, VANCE |
2022-04-04 | House | DP: CLAMAN, TARR, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2022-04-04 | House | STA RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM |
2022-03-09 | House | STA, JUD |
2022-03-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-03-08 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 7(JUD) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | PASSED Y13 N- E6 A1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 7(JUD) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/8 CAL |
2022-03-04 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-03-04 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-04 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2022 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | NR: HUGHES, SHOWER |
2022-02-18 | Senate | DP: MYERS, KIEHL |
2022-02-18 | Senate | AM: HOLLAND |
2022-02-18 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 1AM 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2021-04-23 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | AM: KAWASAKI |
2021-04-23 | Senate | NR: SHOWER, HOLLAND, COSTELLO |
2021-04-23 | Senate | STA RPT 3NR 1AM |
2021-01-22 | Senate | STA, JUD |
2021-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-01-22 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |