AK SB69 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending an exemption from regulation as a public utility for plants and facilities generating electricity entirely from renewable energy resources; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Exempt Renewable Energy Electric Plants
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Revak [R] | Rep. Calvin Schrage [N] | Rep. William Fields [D] | Sen. James Kaufman [R] |
Rep. David Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/21 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 13 SLA 21 |
2021-06-28 | Senate | 9:08 A.M. 6/28/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-07 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): NELSON |
2021-05-07 | House | VERSION: SB 69 AM |
2021-05-07 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-07 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-07 | House | PASSED Y36 N1 E3 |
2021-05-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 69 AM |
2021-05-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-07 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N29 E3 |
2021-05-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN |
2021-05-01 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-05-01 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, SNYDER, NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-05-01 | House | L&C RPT 5DP |
2021-04-28 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2021-04-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-04-14 | House | NR: KAUFMAN, ZULKOSKY |
2021-04-14 | House | DP: CLAMAN, FIELDS, SCHRAGE |
2021-04-14 | House | ENE RPT 3DP 2NR |
2021-04-05 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-04-05 | House | ENE, L&C |
2021-04-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-03-31 | Senate | VERSION: SB 69 AM |
2021-03-31 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-03-31 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 69 AM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/31 CALENDAR |
2021-03-29 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-29 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-29 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | AM: GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, HOLLAND |
2021-03-05 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO |
2021-03-05 | Senate | L&C RPT 1DP 3AM |
2021-02-03 | Senate | L&C |
2021-02-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |