AK SB65 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Jonesville Public Use Area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jonesville Public Use Area

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2018-03-29HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-03-29HouseFIN
2018-03-29HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-28SenateVERSION: CSSB 65(RES)
2018-03-28SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-28SenateVON IMHOF, MICCICHE
2018-03-28SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, MEYER, WILSON, HUGHES, COSTELLO, MACKINNON, GIESSEL
2018-03-28SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-03-28SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 65(RES)
2018-03-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-28SenateRES CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-28SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-28SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2018
2018-03-23SenateFN6: ZERO(DNR)
2018-03-23SenateFN5: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2018-03-23SenateNR: OLSON
2018-03-23SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-03-23SenateFIN RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1NR
2018-03-05SenatePRIME SPONSOR: SHOWER UC
2017-04-10SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-10SenateFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-10SenateFN2: ZERO(DFG)
2017-04-10SenateFN1: ZERO(DNR)
2017-04-10SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEDMAN, MEYER
2017-04-10SenateDP: GIESSEL, HUGHES, COGHILL
2017-04-10SenateRES RPT CS 3DP 3NR SAME TITLE
2017-02-22SenateRES, FIN
2017-02-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback