AK SB64 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to management of enhanced stocks of shellfish; authorizing certain nonprofit organizations to engage in shellfish enhancement projects; relating to application fees for salmon hatchery permits and shellfish enhancement project permits; allowing the Alaska Seafood Marketing Institute to market aquatic farm products; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shellfish Projects; Hatcheries; Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-04-26SenateFN4: INDETERMINATE(REV)
2021-04-26SenateFN2: ZERO(DFG)
2021-04-26SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(DFG)
2021-04-26SenateNR: HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF
2021-04-26SenateDP: BISHOP, STEDMAN
2021-04-28SenateFIN RPT CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE
2021-04-26SenateFIN RPT CS FORTHCOMING 2DP 5NR
2021-03-17SenateFN4: INDETERMINATE(REV)
2021-03-17SenateFN3: ZERO(CED)
2021-03-17SenateFN2: ZERO(DFG)
2021-03-17SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(DFG)
2021-03-17SenateDP: REVAK, KIEHL, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, MICCICHE, STEVENS
2021-03-17SenateRES RPT 6DP
2021-01-29SenateRES, FIN
2021-01-29SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback