AK SB64 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to theft and property offenses; relating to the definition of 'prior convictions' for certain theft offenses; establishing the Alaska Criminal Justice Commission and providing an expiration date; relating to electronic monitoring for certain persons convicted of driving while under the influence; relating to the crime of custodial interference; relating to the duties of the Alaska Judicial Council; relating to jail-time credit for offenders in court-ordered treatment programs; relating to conditions of release, probation, and parole; relating to a mitigating factor for a person suffering from combat-related post-traumatic stress disorder or combat-related traumatic brain injury; relating to duties of the commissioner of corrections and board of parole; establishing a program for reducing recidivism in the Department of Health and Social Services; requiring the commissioner of health and social services to establish programs for persons on conditions of release or probation that require testing for controlled substances and alcoholic beverages; requiring the board of parole to establish programs for persons on parole that require testing for controlled substances and alcoholic beverages; relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus Crime/corrections/recidivism Bill

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 64(FIN)? Effective Dates (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: HCS CSSB 64(FIN) am H Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2014-07-17SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 83 SLA 14
2014-07-14Senate11:13 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-05-15HouseFN25: (H.FIN/DHS)
2014-05-15HouseFN24: (COR)
2014-05-15HouseFN23: (CRT)
2014-05-15HouseFN16: (S.FIN/COR)
2014-05-15HouseFN14: (S.FIN/DHS)
2014-05-15HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
2014-05-15HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
2014-05-15SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
2014-05-19SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE
2014-04-22SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-22SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2014-04-22SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2014-04-23HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 64(FIN) AM H
2014-04-23HouseENGROSSED BILL SENT TO SENATE
2014-04-22HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 64(FIN) AM H
2014-04-22HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2014-04-20HouseENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
2014-04-20HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-20HousePASSED Y40
2014-04-20HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 64(FIN) AM H
2014-04-20HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-20HouseAM NO 5 NOT OFFERED
2014-04-20HouseAM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
2014-04-20HouseAM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
2014-04-20HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2014-04-20HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2014-04-20HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-20HouseFIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-20HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-20HouseRULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/20/2014
2014-04-20HouseFN25: (H.FIN/DHS)
2014-04-20HouseFN24: (COR)
2014-04-20HouseFN23: (CRT)
2014-04-20HouseFN22: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
2014-04-20HouseFN21: ZERO(CRT)
2014-04-20HouseFN16: (S.FIN/COR)
2014-04-20HouseFN14: (S.FIN/DHS)
2014-04-20HouseFN13: ZERO(GOV)
2014-04-20HouseFN10: ZERO(ADM)
2014-04-20HouseFN8: ZERO(ADM)
2014-04-20HouseNR: NEUMAN, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
2014-04-20HouseDP: GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, GARA, HOLMES, MUNOZ, EDGMON
2014-04-20HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 27
2014-04-20HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 6DP 5NR
2014-04-10HouseFN20: ZERO(LAW)
2014-04-10HouseFN19: ZERO(CRT)
2014-04-10HouseFN18: (CRT)
2014-04-10HouseFN17: (COR)
2014-04-10HouseFN16: (S.FIN/COR)
2014-04-10HouseFN15: (S.FIN/DHS)
2014-04-10HouseFN14: (S.FIN/DHS)
2014-04-10HouseFN13: ZERO(GOV)
2014-04-10HouseFN10: ZERO(ADM)
2014-04-10HouseFN9: ZERO(ADM)
2014-04-10HouseFN8: ZERO(ADM)
2014-04-10HouseAM: LEDOUX
2014-04-10HouseNR: PRUITT
2014-04-10HouseDP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, KELLER
2014-04-10HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 27
2014-04-10HouseJUD RPT HCS(JUD) NT 3DP 1NR 1AM
2014-03-17HouseJUD, FIN
2014-03-17HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-03-14SenateVERSION: CSSB 64(FIN)
2014-03-14SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2014-03-14SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-03-14SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2014-03-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 64(FIN)
2014-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-14SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-03-14SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2014
2014-03-14SenateFN19: ZERO(CRT)
2014-03-14SenateFN18: (CRT)
2014-03-14SenateFN17: (COR)
2014-03-14SenateFN16: (S.FIN/COR)
2014-03-14SenateFN15: (S.FIN/DHS)
2014-03-14SenateFN14: (S.FIN/DHS)
2014-03-14SenateFN13: ZERO(GOV)
2014-03-14SenateFN11: ZERO(LAW)
2014-03-14SenateFN10: ZERO(ADM)
2014-03-14SenateFN9: ZERO(ADM)
2014-03-14SenateFN8: ZERO(ADM)
2014-03-14SenateAM: FAIRCLOUGH, DUNLEAVY, BISHOP
2014-03-14SenateNR: OLSON
2014-03-14SenateDP: KELLY, MEYER, HOFFMAN
2014-03-14SenateFIN RPT CS 3DP 1NR 3AM NEW TITLE
2014-02-14SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2014-02-14SenateFN13: ZERO(GOV)
2014-02-14SenateFN12: ZERO(DHS)
2014-02-14SenateFN11: ZERO(LAW)
2014-02-14SenateFN10: ZERO(ADM)
2014-02-14SenateFN9: ZERO(ADM)
2014-02-14SenateFN8: ZERO(ADM)
2014-02-14SenateFN7: (COR)
2014-02-14SenateFN6: (CRT)
2014-02-14SenateNR: OLSON
2014-02-14SenateDP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON
2014-02-14SenateJUD RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2013-04-09SenateFN5: ZERO(ADM)
2013-04-09SenateFN4: ZERO(ADM)
2013-04-09SenateFN3: ZERO(ADM)
2013-04-09SenateFN2: ZERO(COR)
2013-04-09SenateFN1: (CRT)
2013-04-09SenateAM: COGHILL
2013-04-09SenateNR: GIESSEL
2013-04-09SenateDP: DYSON
2013-04-09SenateSTA RPT CS 1DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2013-02-27SenateSTA, JUD
2013-02-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=SB64
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0064A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0064B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0064C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0064D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0064E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0064F.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0064G.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0064Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB64&jrn=1964&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB64&jrn=2712&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB64&jrn=2733&hse=S

Bill Comments

feedback