AK SB63 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act prohibiting smoking in certain places; relating to education on the smoking prohibition; relating to municipal regulation of smoking in certain places; relating to established villages and local option elections to allow smoking in public places; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation Of Smoking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 63(FIN) Effective Dates (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-12SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N2 E1 A1
2018-05-12SenateCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
2018-05-12SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-05-12HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 63(RLS) AM H
2018-05-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-05-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, CLAMAN, SADDLER
2018-05-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12HousePASSED Y32 N7 E1
2018-05-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 63(RLS) AM H
2018-05-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-12HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y18 N21 E1
2018-05-12HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED Y29 N10 A1
2018-05-12HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y35 N4 A1
2018-05-12HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 29
2018-05-12HouseRLS HCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2018
2018-04-11HouseRETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
2018-04-11HouseFN11: ZERO(DOT)
2018-04-11HouseFN10: ZERO(DPS)
2018-04-11HouseFN9: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-11HouseFN8: ZERO(DEC)
2018-04-11HouseFN7: ZERO(CED)
2018-04-11HouseAM: REINBOLD, LEDOUX
2018-04-11HouseNR: STUTES, CHENAULT
2018-04-11HouseDNP: EASTMAN
2018-04-11HouseDP: CLAMAN
2018-04-11HousePENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
2018-04-11HouseRLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 1DP 1DNP 2NR 2AM
2018-04-09HouseRLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A)
2018-04-04HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY
2018-01-26HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): FANSLER
2018-01-26HouseFN11: ZERO(DOT)
2018-01-26HouseFN10: ZERO(DPS)
2018-01-26HouseFN9: ZERO(DHS)
2018-01-26HouseFN8: ZERO(DEC)
2018-01-26HouseFN7: ZERO(CED)
2018-01-26HouseAM: EASTMAN, LEDOUX
2018-01-26HouseNR: REINBOLD
2018-01-26HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, CLAMAN
2018-01-26HouseJUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP 1NR 2AM
2018-01-19HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): PARISH
2017-05-17HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, PRUITT, JOHNSTON, JOHNSON, WOOL, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-05-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-05-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-05-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-04-28HouseFN6: ZERO(DOT)
2017-04-28HouseFN5: ZERO(CED)
2017-04-28HouseFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-28HouseFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2017-04-28HouseFN2: ZERO(DEC)
2017-04-28HouseAM: FANSLER
2017-04-28HouseNR: WESTLAKE, SADDLER, RAUSCHER
2017-04-28HouseDP: TALERICO, DRUMMOND, PARISH
2017-04-28HouseCRA RPT HCS(CRA) 3DP 3NR 1AM
2017-04-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2017-04-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER, GRENN, KAWASAKI, BIRCH
2017-04-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, KITO
2017-04-07HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-29HouseCRA, JUD
2017-03-29HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-27SenateVERSION: CSSB 63(FIN)
2017-03-27SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-03-27SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-03-27SenatePASSED Y15 N5
2017-03-27SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI
2017-03-27SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 63(FIN)
2017-03-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-27SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-27SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-27SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2017
2017-03-21SenateFN6: ZERO(DOT)
2017-03-21SenateFN5: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-21SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-21SenateFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2017-03-21SenateFN2: ZERO(DEC)
2017-03-21SenateNR: DUNLEAVY
2017-03-21SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, OLSON, MICCICHE
2017-03-21SenateFIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2017-03-20SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
2017-03-03SenateFN5: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-03SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-03SenateFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2017-03-03SenateFN2: ZERO(DEC)
2017-03-03SenateFN1: (DOT)
2017-03-03SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE
2017-03-03SenateHSS RPT 5DP
2017-02-22SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MEYER, GARDNER, GIESSEL, STEVENS, BISHOP
2017-02-17SenateHSS, FIN
2017-02-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=SB63
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0063A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0063B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0063C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0063D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0063E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0063F.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0063Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB63&jrn=0662&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB63&jrn=3146&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB63&jrn=3708&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB63&jrn=3709&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB63&jrn=3711&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB63&jrn=3712&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback