AK SB63 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, PRUITT, JOHNSTON, JOHNSON, WOOL, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act prohibiting smoking in certain places; relating to education on the smoking prohibition; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation Of Smoking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, PRUITT, JOHNSTON, JOHNSON, WOOL, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-05-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-05-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2017-05-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-04-28HouseREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2017-04-28HouseFN6: ZERO(DOT)
2017-04-28HouseFN5: ZERO(CED)
2017-04-28HouseFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-28HouseFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2017-04-28HouseFN2: ZERO(DEC)
2017-04-28HouseAM: FANSLER
2017-04-28HouseNR: WESTLAKE, SADDLER, RAUSCHER
2017-04-28HouseDP: TALERICO, DRUMMOND, PARISH
2017-04-28HouseCRA RPT HCS(CRA) 3DP 3NR 1AM
2017-04-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2017-04-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER, GRENN, KAWASAKI, BIRCH
2017-04-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, KITO
2017-04-07HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-29HouseCRA, JUD
2017-03-29HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-27SenateVERSION: CSSB 63(FIN)
2017-03-27SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-03-27SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-03-27SenatePASSED Y15 N5
2017-03-27SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI
2017-03-27SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 63(FIN)
2017-03-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-27SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-27SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-27SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2017
2017-03-21SenateFN6: ZERO(DOT)
2017-03-21SenateFN5: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-21SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-21SenateFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2017-03-21SenateFN2: ZERO(DEC)
2017-03-21SenateNR: DUNLEAVY
2017-03-21SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, OLSON, MICCICHE
2017-03-21SenateFIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2017-03-20SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
2017-03-03SenateFN5: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-03SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-03SenateFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2017-03-03SenateFN2: ZERO(DEC)
2017-03-03SenateFN1: (DOT)
2017-03-03SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE
2017-03-03SenateHSS RPT 5DP
2017-02-22SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MEYER, GARDNER, GIESSEL, STEVENS, BISHOP
2017-02-17SenateHSS, FIN
2017-02-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback