AK SB60 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Uniform Probate Code, including wills, trusts, nonprobate transfers, augmented estates, personal representatives, and trustees; and amending Rules 3 and 8, Alaska Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 1, Alaska Rules of Probate Procedure, and Rule 37.5, Alaska Rules of Administration.
Title
Uniform Probate Code; Trusts, Wills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 64 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 2:50 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-15 | VERSION: CSSB 60(L&C) | |
2010-04-15 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-15 | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-15 | PASSED Y38 A2 | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 60(L&C) | |
2010-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2010 | |
2010-03-26 | FN2: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-03-26 | DP: LYNN, HERRON, GATTO, RAMRAS | |
2010-03-26 | JUD RPT 4DP | |
2010-03-17 | JUD | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-10 | VERSION: CSSB 60(L&C) | |
2010-03-10 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-10 | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-10 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-03-10 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 60(L&C) | |
2010-03-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-10 | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | FN2: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-02-10 | DP: FRENCH, COGHILL, EGAN, MCGUIRE | |
2010-02-10 | JUD RPT CS(L&C) 4DP | |
2009-04-17 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2009-04-17 | AM: PASKVAN, BUNDE | |
2009-04-17 | NR: MEYER, DAVIS | |
2009-04-17 | DP: THOMAS | |
2009-04-17 | L&C RPT CS 1DP 2NR 2AM SAME TITLE | |
2009-01-21 | L&C, JUD | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-21 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/16/09 |