AK SB6 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to early education programs provided by school districts; relating to funding for early education programs; relating to the duties of the Department of Education and Early Development; establishing a reading intervention program for public school students enrolled in grades kindergarten through three; establishing a literacy program in the Department of Education and Early Development; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pre-k/elem Ed Programs/funding; Reading

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2020-02-19SenateFN5: (EED/FUND CAP)
2020-02-19SenateFN4: (EED)
2020-02-19SenateFN3: (EED)
2020-02-19SenateFN2: (EED)
2020-02-19SenateFN1: ZERO(EED)
2020-02-17SenateNR: COGHILL, HUGHES, COSTELLO
2020-02-17SenateDP: STEVENS, BEGICH
2020-02-17SenateEDC RPT CS 2DP 3NR NEW TITLE
2020-01-21SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, GIESSEL
2020-01-21SenateEDC, FIN
2020-01-21SenateSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
2019-03-25SenateCOSPONSOR(S): OLSON, KIEHL
2019-03-20SenateCOSPONSOR(S): STEVENS
2019-01-16SenateEDC, FIN
2019-01-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-01-16SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback