AK SB6 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN15: (H.FIN/DNR)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the regulation and production of industrial hemp; relating to industrial hemp pilot programs; providing that industrial hemp is not included in the definition of 'marijuana'; providing that cannabidiol oil is not included in the definition of 'hashish oil'; clarifying that adding industrial hemp to food does not create an adulterated food product; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial Hemp Product.;cannabidiol Oil

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 1 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseFN15: (H.FIN/DNR)
2018-06-27HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-27HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-06-27SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-04-13SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/13/18
2018-04-13SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 4/12 CHAPTER 5 SLA 18
2018-04-12SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-04-12Senate8:32 AM 4/12/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-02-21SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-02-21SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- A1 V1
2018-02-21SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-02-19HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 6(FIN)(EFD ADD H)
2018-02-19HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-02-19HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, GUTTENBERG, MILLETT, LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, TUCK
2018-02-19HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 16
2018-02-19HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-02-19HousePASSED Y36 E3 V1
2018-02-19HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 6(FIN)(EFD ADD H)
2018-02-19HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-02-19HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N35 E3 V1
2018-02-19House...TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
2018-02-19HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2018-02-19HouseFIN HCS ADOPTED UC
2018-02-19HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2018
2018-02-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KOPP, LINCOLN, PARISH
2018-02-14HouseFIRST CROSS SPONSOR: DRUMMOND
2018-02-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, WILSON
2018-02-12HouseFN15: (H.FIN/DNR)
2018-02-12HouseFN14: ZERO(DPS)
2018-02-12HouseFN13: ZERO(DPS)
2018-02-12HouseFN12: ZERO(LAW)
2018-02-12HouseFN11: ZERO(CED)
2018-02-12HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2018-02-12HouseDP: GRENN, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, GARA, WILSON, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-02-12HousePENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
2018-02-12HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 8DP 1AM
2017-05-03HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, GRENN
2017-04-12HouseFIRST CROSS SPONSOR: KAWASAKI
2017-04-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-04-11HouseFIN
2017-04-11HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-10SenateVERSION: CSSB 6(JUD)
2017-04-10SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-04-10SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-04-10SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, BEGICH
2017-04-10SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 6(JUD)
2017-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-10SenateJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-10SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-10SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2017
2017-04-10SenateFN10: (S.FIN/DNR)
2017-04-10SenateFN8: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-10SenateFN7: ZERO(CED)
2017-04-10SenateFN6: ZERO(LAW)
2017-04-10SenateFN5: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-10SenateNR: MACKINNON, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, MICCICHE
2017-04-10SenateDP: HOFFMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF
2017-04-10SenateFIN RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 4NR
2017-04-07SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP
2017-03-22SenateFN9: (DNR)
2017-03-22SenateFN8: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-22SenateFN7: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-22SenateFN6: ZERO(LAW)
2017-03-22SenateFN5: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-22SenateDP: COGHILL, KELLY, MEYER, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI
2017-03-22SenateJUD RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
2017-02-17SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2017-02-17SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-02-17SenateFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2017-02-17SenateFN2: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
2017-02-17SenateFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2017-02-17SenateNR: STEDMAN
2017-02-17SenateDP: GIESSEL, HUGHES, COGHILL, VON IMHOF, MEYER
2017-02-17SenateRES RPT CS 5DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2017-01-18SenateRES, JUD
2017-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=SB6
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0006A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0006B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0006C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0006D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0006E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0006Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB6&jrn=0869&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB6&jrn=2476&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB6&jrn=2477&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB6&jrn=2077&hse=S

Bill Comments

feedback