AK SB6 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act exempting the state from daylight saving time; petitioning the United States Department of Transportation to change the time zones of Alaska; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Eliminate Daylight Saving Time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: CSSB 6(FIN) Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-04-08 | House | FN3: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2016-04-08 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-04-08 | House | NR: SPOHNHOLZ, STUTES, TALERICO, LYNN |
2016-04-08 | House | DNP: KREISS-TOMKINS |
2016-04-08 | House | DP: KELLER, VAZQUEZ |
2016-04-08 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 29 |
2016-04-08 | House | STA RPT HCS(STA) NT 2DP 1DNP 4NR |
2015-04-11 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLER |
2015-03-16 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA |
2015-03-12 | House | STA |
2015-03-12 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-03-11 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 6(FIN) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-03-11 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N4 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 6(FIN) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/11 CALENDAR |
2015-03-09 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-03-09 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-03-09 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2015-03-04 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2015-03-04 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2015-03-02 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE |
2015-02-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | DP: STOLTZE, COGHILL, HUGGINS, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI |
2015-02-11 | Senate | STA RPT 5DP |
2015-01-23 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, DUNLEAVY, BISHOP |
2015-01-21 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2015-01-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-01-21 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15 |